Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Robin Adams As Administrator Of The Goods, Chattels And Credits Of Otilia Adams, Deceased, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Drelich, Gloria, against Spring Creek Rehabilitation And Nursing Care Ctr., Willoughby Rehabilitation And Health Care Center, Llc, represented by Corcoran, Ruth, Giannettino, Mario Christopher, Mandell, Jacqueline, Robin, Caitlin A, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Michelle Weston presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMichelle Weston Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time2033 days |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 20, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 02, 2018STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 08, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 28, 2015DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: March 26, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 15, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 18, 2017ORDER - OTHER (Motion #4)
Date: November 09, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #4)
Date: November 06, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: September 12, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: July 24, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: May 29, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #4)
Date: May 29, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: October 06, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: February 21, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: November 08, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: September 09, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 15, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: March 17, 2015ANSWER
Date: April 08, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 25, 2019 | Hearing |
SETTLED (Conversion) PART 3 Judge: Weston, Hon. Michelle |
|
June 26, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned PART 3 O/R FOR TIAL (Conversion) Judge: Weston, Hon. Michelle |
|
June 25, 2019 | Hearing |
MED MAL TRIAL READINESS PART
Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Expert Disclosure Pursuant to CPLR 3101(D) |
|
June 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
May 03, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned MED MAL TRIAL READINESS PART Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
April 18, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE *Corrected* Notice of Appeal |
|
April 08, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned MED MAL TRIAL READINESS PART Judge: Edwards, Hon. Genine D. |
|
April 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Order with Notice of Entry |
|
March 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #4) dated 3/20/19 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.