Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Ka Yi Wong, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Liu, Stanley C., Wong, Andy On-Tik, against Feng Hua Kong Aka Wendy Kong, Jane Doe, Joe Joe, John Doe, Yuda Inc D B A Jblu Spa, (total of 5) See All represented by Hsu, Allen Y., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCommercial |
Last RefreshedJanuary 27, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
ANSWER
Date: January 27, 2014RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 25, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2021 | Hearing |
INTAKE PART
Judge: Walker, Hon. Edgar G. |
|
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI) | |
February 13, 2017 | Docket Event | CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) | |
March 25, 2014 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO DEMAND | |
January 27, 2014 | Docket Event | ANSWER | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.