Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Emily Price, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Flanzig, Cathy S, against Eileen Tasber, Jane Doe, Sean D Rbady, represented by Casey, Jennifer A, Emerenini, Chikodi Ebere, Gomez, Jose M, Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Kenneth P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth P Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1156 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: November 12, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: October 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2015ORDER - OTHER *Corrected*
Date: February 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: September 29, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)
Date: October 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2)
Date: November 19, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 06, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: August 19, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2015ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: February 24, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 11, 2015ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: November 20, 2014ANSWER
Date: November 14, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 12, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 23, 2014ANSWER
Date: July 11, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 25, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 25, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 STYLFTE (Conversion) Judge: Sherman, Hon. Kenneth P. |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER *Corrected* (appellate div.) dtd 12/14/2016, nsp |
|
February 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Stay Lifted CLERK'S OFFICE Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) | |
September 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Stay JURY COORDINATING PART 1 APPLDIV (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
August 11, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 4SEL722 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
July 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 3SEL601 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.