Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Emily Price, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Flanzig, Cathy S, against Eileen Tasber, Jane Doe, Sean D Rbady, represented by Casey, Jennifer A, Emerenini, Chikodi Ebere, Gomez, Jose M, Yong, Jeffrey P, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Kenneth P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKenneth P Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1156 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT (FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID)
Date: November 12, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: January 20, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: October 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 24, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2015ORDER - OTHER *Corrected*
Date: February 24, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: September 29, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)
Date: October 06, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #2)
Date: November 19, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: September 29, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 06, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: August 19, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: August 18, 2015ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: February 24, 2015STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 11, 2015ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: November 20, 2014ANSWER
Date: November 14, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 12, 2014STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: July 23, 2014ANSWER
Date: July 11, 2014STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: June 25, 2014ANSWER
Date: March 25, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 30, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2017 | Hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 STYLFTE (Conversion) Judge: Sherman, Hon. Kenneth P. |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER *Corrected* (appellate div.) dtd 12/14/2016, nsp |
|
February 14, 2017 | Hearing |
Stay Lifted CLERK'S OFFICE Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) | |
December 21, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY (Motion #1) | |
September 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Stay JURY COORDINATING PART 1 APPLDIV (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
September 15, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
August 11, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 4SEL722 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
July 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 3SEL601 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.