Your recipients will receive an email with this envelope shortly and will be able to access it on trellis. You can always see your envelopes by clicking the Inbox on the top right hand corner.
Jacob Sabbagh v. The City Of New York
On December 30, 2013 a tort case was filed by Jacob Sabbagh, represented by Levy, Joseph D, against The City Of New York, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. Judge Reginald Boddie presiding.
Case Details
Case Number
Filing Date
December 30, 2013
Last Refreshed
July 21, 2023
Filing Location
Kings County, NY
Filing Court House
Kings County Supreme Court
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Johnny Lee;Category
Tort
Practice Area
Torts
Matter Type
General Torts
Case Outcome Type
Disposed
Status
Closed
Case Duration
1 month and 2 days
OTHER JUDGES ON THIS CASE
Parties
Plaintiffs
Attorneys for Plaintiffs
Defendants
Case Documents
ORDER - OTHER
Date: Feb 05, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: Feb 05, 2014PETITION
Date: Dec 30, 2013RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: Dec 30, 2013Case Events
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER Order To Show Cause dated 1/31/14 |
|
February 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER order dated 1/31/14 filed CC 2/4/14 |
|
January 31, 2014 | hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 7 SFO (Conversion) Judge: Baynes, Hon. Johnny Lee |
|
January 10, 2014 | Motion |
Leave to File (Motion #001) Decided: 01/31/2014Closed Before Justice: Baynes, Hon. Johnny Lee Answer demanded: No Judge: Baynes, Hon. Johnny Lee |
|
January 10, 2014 | hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PART Judge: Baynes, Hon. Johnny Lee |
|
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION | |
December 30, 2013 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE |