Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Srp 2012-4, Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Falkowski, Michal, Richland, Daniel H, Richland, Daniel H., against Me Me Nwe, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Wavny Toussaint presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 05, 2015 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions544 days |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time764 days |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #1)
Date: December 30, 2016NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 11, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 13, 2016JUDGMENT
Date: August 11, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: December 30, 2016JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1)
Date: December 30, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 13, 2016COMPLAINT
Date: July 05, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry, Judgment, and Affirmation of Service | |
August 11, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
August 07, 2017 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) DEFAULT JUDGMENT PT 1-INQUEST J.G. (Conversion) Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
|
August 07, 2017 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT - SIGNED BY COURT TO COUNTY CLERK (Motion #1) | |
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #1) Notice of Settlement |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affirmation of Service |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Affirmation in Support |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
BILL OF COSTS (Motion #1) Bill of Costs |
|
December 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) (Motion #1) Proposed Judgment |
|
December 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #001) DEFAULT JUDGMENT PART 1 GSON (Conversion) Judge: Knipel, Hon. Lawrence S. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.