Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Allan Crockwell, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Cherny, Aleksandr Simon, against Cleotia Wade, represented by Gunsburg, Shlomo Z., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Bernard J. Graham, Pt 36 presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 24, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time847 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 24, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 13, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 19, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 05, 2014AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 12, 2014AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 13, 2014PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S)
Date: September 11, 2014RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 15, 2014ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: January 28, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 19, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
April 19, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 28, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 1/15/15 filed CC 1/20/15 |
|
September 11, 2014 | Docket Event | PRE-TRIAL DOCUMENT(S) | |
June 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE order dated 5/29/14 filed CC 6/3/14 |
|
March 15, 2014 | Docket Event | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | |
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
March 13, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT cleotia wade |
|
March 12, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.