Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Southern Wine & Spirits Of New York, Inc., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Klass, Richard A, against John Piccione, Uncork Wine & Spirits Shop Inc., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 24, 2013 |
CategoryContract (Non-Commercial) |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions174 days |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Cycle Time175 days |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 24, 2013SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: August 12, 2014JUDGMENT
Date: June 19, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 12, 2014 | Docket Event | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | |
June 19, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
June 16, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COUNTY CLERK (PROPOSED) | |
February 07, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 24, 2013 | Docket Event | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.