Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Emily Longfield, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Garafola, George J, against Brooklyn Bridge Park Corporation, Brooklyn Bridge Park Development Corporation, New York State Urban Development Corporation D B A Empire State Development Corporation, St. Ann'S Warehouse, Inc., represented by , Redmond, Loretta A, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp7 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKings Cdp7 Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 21, 2022 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedOctober 15, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: May 02, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: July 05, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 05, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: July 05, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 05, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 05, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: July 05, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 05, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 05, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 05, 2022CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 05, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 03, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: July 05, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 21, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: July 05, 2022ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 09, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 13, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 20, 2023RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: January 20, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 13, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 21, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Ninety-Day Notice |
||
June 13, 2023 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 13, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Third Good Faith Letter to Plaintiff |
||
January 20, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Second Good Faith Letter request for discovery |
||
January 20, 2023 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
October 21, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Good Faith Letter re Outstanding Discovery |
||
July 06, 2022 |
CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (PRE RJI) St. Ann's Warehouse, Inc. Consent to Change Attorneys |
||
July 05, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION of Plaintiff |
||
July 05, 2022 |
DEMAND FOR: Demand for Cellphone Records/Authorization & Notice to Preserve |
||
July 05, 2022 |
NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION of Brooklyn Bridge Park Corporation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.