Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Structured Settlement Lending Services, Llc D B A Structured Settlement Loan Program, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Brandimarte, Luigi, against Metlife Tower Resources Group, Inc., Metropolitan Life Insurance Company, Shakeem Robinson, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Debra Silber presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDebra Silber Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2013 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time50 days |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: February 11, 2014PETITION
Date: December 18, 2013ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: December 18, 2013NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 20, 2014EXHIBIT(S)
Date: December 18, 2013NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 21, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 16, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: February 14, 2014ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 11, 2014RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 18, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
February 20, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
February 14, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) order dated 2/6/14 filed CC 2/10/14 |
|
February 11, 2014 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | |
February 06, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 9 Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
January 16, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
December 20, 2013 | Motion |
Transfer - Structured Settlement (Motion #001) Decided: 02/06/2014Closed Before Justice: Silber, Hon. Debra Answer demanded: No Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
December 20, 2013 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PART Judge: Silber, Hon. Debra |
|
December 18, 2013 | Docket Event | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.