Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
In The Matter Of The Application Of Government Employees Insurance Company To Stay The Arbitration,, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Weber, Andrew Nelson, against Aldon C Noel, Country-Wide Insurance Company, David Bethea, Kingston Insurance Company, Latifat Oladele, (total of 5) See All represented by Gordon, Ira Bradley, Jaskot, Katherine M., Scoll, Svetlana, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with David Schmidt (Pt. 47) presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDavid Schmidt (Pt. 47) Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 18, 2013 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1272 days |
STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: February 06, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 07, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2014AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #001)
Date: May 22, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 02, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 02, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 07, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - a
Date: December 18, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - c
Date: December 18, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - d
Date: December 18, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - b
Date: December 18, 2013RJI -RE: OTHER(SPECIFY IN DESCRIPTION AREA)
Date: December 19, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 07, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: September 02, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 19, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 07, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 02, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 18, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: April 07, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 03, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: August 20, 2014STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 12, 2017PETITION
Date: December 18, 2013NOTICE OF PETITION Â (Motion #001)
Date: December 19, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 12, 2017 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | |
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) order dated 4/14/14 filed CC 8/19/14 |
|
June 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) order dated 4/14/14 filed CC 6/16/14 |
|
May 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #001) supplemental affidavit of Melissa Scanlon |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Note of Entry with Order |
|
May 02, 2014 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Exhibit B |
|
April 07, 2014 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Exhibit C |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.