Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Nathaniel Grayton, Sherri Skidmore, filed a(n) Malpractice - Torts case represented by Grossman, Michael Bruce, Lockhart, Brian Christopher, against Calixto Cazano Md, Fernando Ginebra Md, Rajendra Bhayani Md, Sony Loiseau Md, Vasudha Viswanathan Md, (total of 6) See All represented by Benvenuto, Thomas J, Dainow, Jacquelyn Alisa, Etheridge, Emmarie Ariana, Fletcher, Lisa, Garry, Steven Edward, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Bernard J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBernard J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryMedical Malpractice |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeMalpractice |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 17, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 11, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 10, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 10, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: April 11, 2019ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED Â (Motion #8)
Date: April 22, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: April 05, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 29, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: November 05, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: January 20, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 22, 2018RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MEDICAL, DENTAL OR PODIATRIC MALPRACTICE
Date: March 17, 2014STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF CONFERENCE
Date: May 28, 2014ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 10, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 20, 2015AFFIRMATION
Date: March 15, 2016ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 15, 2015AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: January 20, 2015CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 02, 2015ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: February 04, 2020NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 15, 2014NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 15, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Bills of Particular
Date: March 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 28, 2019NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: December 14, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 28, 2019AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: May 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 22, 2021CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 23, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: September 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - c  (Motion #6)
Date: April 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S)  - g  (Motion #6)
Date: April 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S)  - d  (Motion #6)
Date: April 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #12) PC Order dated 6/30/2014 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: March 28, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - f  (Motion #6)
Date: April 10, 2019ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #12)
Date: September 20, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - a  (Motion #6)
Date: April 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S)  - b  (Motion #6)
Date: April 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 24, 2021STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: May 26, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 11, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 12, 2020STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE
Date: August 27, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 29, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 29, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: October 08, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 29, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: February 22, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 10, 2016AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 12, 2014EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 15, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2017AFFIRMATION
Date: February 21, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #12) Court Order dated 3/15/2021 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #12) Court Order dated 11/7/2018 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #3)
Date: February 22, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #12) Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #12) Court Order dated 1/31/2020 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #12) Court Order dated 3/30/2015 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 22, 2018AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #4) AffGoodCause-MotNOI Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 26, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #12) Court Order dated 3/10/2017 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #5)
Date: May 22, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: June 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: March 28, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #14) BPs as to Drs. Cazano and Ginebra
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 03, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: February 03, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10)
Date: February 03, 2021EXHIBIT(S)  - e  (Motion #6)
Date: April 10, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 22, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #11) Verified Bill of Particulars
Date: February 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #11)
Date: February 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #9)
Date: March 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #12)
Date: August 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #12) Court Order dated 6/08/2016 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #13) Verified Bill of Particulars
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #12) Court Order dated 11/08/2017 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #12) Court Order dated 6/12/2018 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: September 13, 2021STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: May 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: August 24, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #13)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #14) Wyckoff Heights Medical Record Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 05, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: November 15, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #13)
Date: May 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: November 15, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 26, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #14)
Date: October 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 17, 2016ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #8)
Date: May 28, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 18, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 29, 2017STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 13, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 12, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: March 15, 2016ANSWER
Date: April 05, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 18, 2016ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 28, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 05, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 22, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 22, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 28, 2019LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 22, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #4) *Corrected*
Date: October 26, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 22, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: February 22, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: January 13, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 22, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: November 10, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 18, 2016RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 12, 2014ANSWER
Date: January 31, 2014ANSWER
Date: January 15, 2014DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 15, 2014DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 15, 2014NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 15, 2014DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: January 15, 2014ANSWER
Date: January 15, 2014NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: January 15, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 26, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
May 25, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #13) Also with Motion Seq #14 & 15 |
||
November 15, 2021 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
November 15, 2021 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
October 05, 2021 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #13) Notice of Motion, Certification, Back |
||
October 05, 2021 | STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS | ||
October 05, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #13) Summons and Complaint |
||
October 05, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #13) Answer-Bhayani MD |
||
October 05, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #13) EBT transcript-Sherri Skidmore part 1 |
||
October 05, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #13) EBT transcript Sherri Skidmore part 2 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.