Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Elizabeth Taylor, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Krigsfeld, Michael, against The City Of New York, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Kings Cdp25 presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKings Cdp25 Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedDecember 25, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1568 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 19, 2018ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 04, 2016AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 07, 2014RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 12, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 12, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 21, 2016NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: September 21, 2016ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: December 21, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 13, 2017NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: September 21, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 01, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 09, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 29, 2018ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 24, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 17, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 29, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dated 3/2/18 |
|
March 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 3/6/18 nsp. |
|
January 19, 2018 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation in Opposition |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION | |
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 1 (Motion #1) Original Summons and Complaint |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #1) Answer |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 3 (Motion #1) Preliminary Conf Order |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #1) Defendant Witness Deposition Transcript |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #1) Plaintiff's Affidavit of Merit |
|
October 13, 2017 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #1) Compliance Conf Orders |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.