Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Citimortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Broyles, Mark K., Case, David P, against Belfour European Closet Inc. D B A European Closet And Cabinet, John Doe And Jane Doe, Mordechai Katz, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 8) See All represented by Nicholson, Yolande Imelda, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Mark I presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMark I Track Judge’s New Cases |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1087 days |
NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 16, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5
Date: March 31, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 31, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 08, 2014NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: January 13, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 31, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 31, 2013NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 17, 2013AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2014RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: January 17, 2014NOTICE TO COUNTY CLERK - AMENDMENT OF CAPTION
Date: December 03, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: March 23, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 17, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 08, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 17, 2013ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: December 28, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 31, 2013EXPARTE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 31, 2015ANSWER
Date: February 26, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 17, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 13, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY | |
December 28, 2016 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY | |
December 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #001) For. Resolution Part1-Motion FINAL (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
December 08, 2016 | Hearing |
Held Foreclosure Resolution PT 1 Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
November 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) For. Resolution Part1-Motion FINAL (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
November 09, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Foreclosure Resolution PT 1 W/MS#1 (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
September 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) For. Resolution Part1-Motion W/CONF (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
September 23, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Foreclosure Resolution PT 1 W/MS#1 (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
July 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) For. Resolution Part1-Motion W/CONF (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
July 21, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned Foreclosure Resolution PT 1 Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.