Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Patricia Romano, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Schnapp, Elliot, Thayer, James M, against Jack Basch, Shiel Medical Laboratory, Inc. A K A Bim Medical, Inc., Spectra Laboratories, Inc., represented by Bonfield, Howard S, Donovan, Joseph T, Hirschler, Arthur A, Kelton, Justin Tyler, Nash, Kevin J, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Martin M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMartin M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 12, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
Last RefreshedOctober 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Case Cycle Time1036 days |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: August 03, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 23, 2018STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: June 14, 2016STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 22, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 06, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: July 27, 2016ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 27, 2018ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #5)
Date: March 07, 2019ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 12, 2016STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: March 18, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: August 03, 2016ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: November 17, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 01, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 08, 2019STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: October 04, 2017STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: September 28, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 07, 2018INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: October 24, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 21, 2017COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: September 26, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: June 29, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: February 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 22, 2019MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: February 08, 2019MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 05, 2019AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 07, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 22, 2019NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 22, 2019ANSWER
Date: October 16, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #4) *Corrected*
Date: June 07, 2018STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: July 18, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 02, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: June 29, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: June 29, 2018RESPONSE TO STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: June 07, 2018MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: June 07, 2018STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: April 24, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: May 01, 2018AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 01, 2018NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 07, 2018STIPULATION - BRIEFING SCHEDULE
Date: May 30, 2018MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION
Date: September 09, 2016STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: April 16, 2018STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: May 01, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 01, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 03, 2016ANSWER
Date: December 08, 2016MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: November 10, 2016RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: August 03, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: May 12, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2019 | STIPULATION - SO ORDERED | ||
March 14, 2019 | Hearing |
SETTLED (Conversion) COMMERCIAL PART 11 Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
March 07, 2019 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #5) dtd 3/6/19 |
||
March 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #007) COMMERCIAL PART 11 SFO (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
March 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #007) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
March 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #006) Motion Oral Argument, Comm 11 SFO (Conversion) Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
March 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #005) Motion Oral Argument, Comm 11 Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
March 01, 2019 | Motion |
Subpoena (Motion #007) Decided: 03/06/2019Granted Before Justice: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. Answer demanded: No Judge: Ash, Hon. Sylvia G. |
|
March 01, 2019 | PROOF OF SERVICE | ||
March 01, 2019 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.