Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp., Csab Mortgage-Backed Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Wallace, Lisa L, against Carleen Seymour, Javier Davila, Jorge Vega, Luis Sanchez, Luz Sanchez, (total of 7) See All represented by Edwards, Arthur Aden, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Francois A presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 10, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1294 days |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3)
Date: April 21, 2017NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: April 21, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 30, 2014ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 14, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: October 22, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: April 21, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY (Motion #1)
Date: November 12, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 15, 2015ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 21, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 26, 2013ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #3)
Date: July 07, 2017NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2)
Date: March 31, 2017ANSWER
Date: January 08, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 10, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 07, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER - DISCONTINUING ACTION AND CANCELING NOTICE OF PENDENCY (Motion #3) | |
June 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Fully Submitted (Motion #003) For. Resolution Part1-Motion NA DEFT (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
May 31, 2017 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) For. Resolution Part1-Motion ADM ADJ D (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
May 17, 2017 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #002) For. Resolution Part1-Motion BY NOTC (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
April 24, 2017 | Motion |
Discontinue (Motion #003) Decided: 06/26/2017Closed Before Justice: Dear, Hon. Noach Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #3) | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3) | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) | |
April 21, 2017 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT (Motion #3) | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Motion #2) WOG 20155471 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.