Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Eileen Lopez Individually, Sophia Lopez By Her Mother And Natural Guardian Eileen Lopez And, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Cardillo, Christopher S, against An Ju Le Ye Llc, represented by Mangini, Michael Louis, Sjoquist, Chad E, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Bert Bunyan (Pt. 8) presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateAugust 12, 2014 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time479 days |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 13, 2015ANSWER
Date: November 21, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 06, 2015DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: November 21, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: December 15, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: January 27, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 05, 2016LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 30, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 14, 2015SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 12, 2014LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 03, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED ) (Motion #2)
Date: December 15, 2015NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER
Date: March 08, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #2)
Date: December 15, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 18, 2015INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED)
Date: March 08, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: December 15, 2015RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: March 18, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED ORDER/COUNTER ORDER | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | INFANT COMPROMISE ORDER (PROPOSED) | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | ADMISSION OF SERVICE | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Retainer Statement |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Medical Records |
|
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT | |
March 08, 2016 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
February 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Granted (Motion #002) Motion Trial Term 8 SUB ORD (Conversion) Judge: Bunyan, Hon. Bert A. |
|
January 15, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #002) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: Bunyan, Hon. Bert A. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.