Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Bp Bronx Tic, Llc, Bp Group De, Llc, Mark Caller Individually And Derivatively On Behalf Of Bp Group De, Llc And Bp Tic, Llc, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Malyshev, Alexander, Nemon, Jacob Hershel, Nolette, Vincent Michael, against Isdok, Llc, Robert Kodsi, represented by Brett, Matthew Samuel, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 11, 2024 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedMarch 14, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
The legal document filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, involves a complaint by BP Group DE, LLC, BP Bronx TIC, LLC, and Mark Caller against Robert Kodsi and ISDOK, LLC. The complaint alleges breach of fiduciary duty,...
ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C)
Date: March 12, 2024RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E *Corrected*
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP *Corrected*
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: March 11, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED ) *Corrected*
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 11, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: March 11, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law (with Bookmarks and Hyperlinks) in Support of Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Memorandum of Law (with Bookmarks and Hyperlinks) in Support of Order to Show Cause for Preliminary ... show more |
||
March 12, 2024 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Memorandum of Law in Support of Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restra Memorandum of Law in Support of Order to Show Cause for Preliminary Injunction with Temporary Restra ... show more |
||
March 12, 2024 | ADDENDUM - COMMERCIAL DIVISION (840C) | ||
March 12, 2024 |
RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Request for Judicial Intervention |
||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F Exhibit F - First Amendment to The Inspired Community Project lease, dated March 6, 2024 |
||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Exhibit E - Board Meeting Minutes, dated January 30, 2024 |
||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D Exhibit D - Email chain between Mark Caller and Colliers |
||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Exhibit C - Verified Complaint, dated March 11, 2024 |
||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Exhibit B - BP Bronx TIC, LLC operating agreement |
||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A Exhibit A - BP Bronx TIC, LLC lease with The Inspired Community Project, dated February 9, 2024 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.