Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Clattenburg, Andrea Rose, Di Caro, John A, Dunn, David, Fried, Lisa Jean, Sillett, Richard Allan, (total of 5) See All against John Does And Jane Does, Said Names Being Fictitious, Parties Intended Being Possible Tenants Or Occupants Of Premises And Corporations, Other Entities Or Persons Who Have Claim Or May Claim A Lien Against, Or Other Interest In The Premises, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau, Rodney Sapini, (total of 6) See All represented by Alexander, Samantha Sharlene, Donald, Farrel R., in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Cenceria Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 02, 2015 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2017SUMMONS + COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 02, 2015ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: July 27, 2015LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: April 19, 2017ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2015ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 14, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION AND IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: November 16, 2017MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION AND IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 05, 2018ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 22, 2018INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 21, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: July 13, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: June 02, 2015CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: June 02, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 21, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2016NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: April 21, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 27, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 08, 2017CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: July 27, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 17, 2015NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 17, 2015RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: June 17, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 13, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 17, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 16, 2015AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 15, 2015AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 21, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1) First Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1) First Mortgage Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: January 22, 2016EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1) Second Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 22, 2016NOTICE OF DEPOSITION/SUBPOENA
Date: July 07, 2017CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: September 17, 2020NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: September 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1) Consolidated Note Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1) Notice of Right to Cancel Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1) URLA and GFE Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1) TILA Statement Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1) HUD-1 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - T Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - W Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - U Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - Y Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - V Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - Z Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 22, 2018AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 22, 2018SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: March 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 16, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 22, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: December 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 14, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 17, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - X Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - S Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - R Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 10, 2017EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 22, 2018STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING
Date: September 20, 2019AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 17, 2020NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: November 06, 2018NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: June 03, 2022STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF HEARING
Date: January 08, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: August 24, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 21, 2019CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: June 08, 2018LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 03, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 14, 2020CONSENT TO CHANGE ATTORNEY (POST RJI)
Date: February 26, 2021NOTICE TO ADMIT
Date: March 21, 2019EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: June 08, 2018EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) CEMA with exhibits Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: July 14, 2017NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: February 09, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: December 04, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 17, 2015INTERROGATORIES
Date: January 21, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 02, 2015REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: August 17, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 14, 2017STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 15, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 11, 2017ORDER - OTHER
Date: May 02, 2018Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 09, 2023 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
December 21, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) dtd 10/20/22 |
||
June 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 (Motion #3) Amended Answer |
||
June 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 (Motion #3) 5.24.22 Correspondence |
||
June 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 (Motion #3) 02.22.22 Correspondence |
||
June 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 (Motion #3) 04.28.22 Correspondence |
||
June 03, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #3) Affirmation of Richard A. Sillett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants Rodney Sapin Affirmation of Richard A. Sillett in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Defendants Rodney Sapin ... show more |
||
June 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 (Motion #3) Deposition Notices |
||
June 03, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #3) Affirmation of Good Faith of Richard A. Sillett |
||
June 03, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 5 (Motion #3) Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.