Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Good Fortune Supermarket Of Brooklyn, Inc., Good Fortune Supermarket Of Elmhurst, Inc., Good Fortune Supermarket Of Nj, Inc., Kuan He Wu, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Liu, Yu-Xi, Xie, Xiang, against Li Hui Zhang, Sai Lu Pan, represented by Antar, Mark Nathan, Ross, Burton R, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Karen B. Rothenberg, Pt 35 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Case Cycle Time266 days |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: June 23, 2014AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: June 11, 2014NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #001)
Date: March 10, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2014 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) order dated 6/12/14 filed CC 6/19/14 |
||
June 12, 2014 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) Motion Trial Term 35 Judge: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. |
|
June 11, 2014 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
April 18, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. |
|
April 16, 2014 | Motion |
Dismiss (Motion #001) Decided: 06/12/2014Closed Before Justice: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Rothenberg, Hon. Karen B. |
|
March 10, 2014 |
RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001) RJI |
||
March 10, 2014 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001) Honig Affirmation |
||
March 10, 2014 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #001) Agreement |
||
March 10, 2014 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #001) Affidavit of Service |
||
March 10, 2014 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #001) Summons and Complaint |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.