Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, As Trustee Of The Residential Asset Securitization Trust 2007-A8, Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2007-H Under The Pooling And Servicing Agreement Dated June 1, 2007, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wallace, Lisa L, against Hsbc Bank Nevada Na, John Doe #1 To John Doe #10, Migna Esposito, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, (total of 7) See All represented by Litvin, Gennady, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with David B presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateSeptember 19, 2013 |
CategoryForeclosure (Residential Mortgage) |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time348 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 18, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 02, 2013ORDER - OTHER
Date: July 16, 2014SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: September 19, 2013STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: September 02, 2014Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2014 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) Conference Part 2 DISC (Conversion) Judge: Dear, Hon. Noach |
|
September 24, 2014 | Hearing |
Not Settled - Represented Conference Part 4 Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Vaughan, Hon. David B. |
|
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | AFFIRMATION | |
September 02, 2014 | Docket Event | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | |
July 16, 2014 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER (Directive) dated 7/8/14 filed CC 7/10/14 |
|
July 08, 2014 | Hearing |
Not Settled - Unrepresented FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONF A Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Vaughan, Hon. David B. |
|
May 07, 2014 | Hearing |
Continued Foreclosure Screening Sett PT Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Vaughan, Hon. David B. |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | |
January 21, 2014 | Hearing |
Continued FORECLOSURE PRE-SETTLEMENT Supreme Initial (first time on) (Conversion) Judge: Vaughan, Hon. David B. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.