Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cheryl Follman, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Leitner, Kenneth Adam, Tolchin, Robert Joseph, against City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, Esposito, Joseph Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp7 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 03, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Premises) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 03, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 06, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 14, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 14, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 13, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 09, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: May 03, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: April 14, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 09, 2023NOTICE OF DEPOSITION UPON ORAL EXAMINATION
Date: February 07, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: May 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 09, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: May 09, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 09, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 09, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 23, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 23, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 26, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 23, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 23, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
August 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #2) Photo of Defect - Avenue H & East 12th Street |
||
August 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #2) FOIL Request Letter |
||
August 23, 2023 |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2) Notice of Motion |
||
August 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH (Motion #2) Affirmation of Good Faith |
||
August 23, 2023 |
CERTIFICATE OF MERIT (Motion #2) Certificate of Merit |
||
August 23, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2) Affirmation in Support of Motion |
||
August 23, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Google Maps Photos - September 2014 & August 2018 |
||
August 23, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #2) Affirmation of Service |
||
June 14, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.