Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Mantis Funding Llc, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Zachter, Jeffrey S, against T. Jones Trucking, Llc, Tonette Andrea Jones, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Joanne D. Quinones presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 17, 2022 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract - Other |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 17, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 14, 2022ANSWER
Date: March 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: March 14, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Un-Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: June 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 24, 2022JUDGMENT
Date: July 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #03)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 10, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #03) *Corrected*
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #03)
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #01)
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #02)
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN FURTHER SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #03)
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: August 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #01)
Date: August 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #03) Sep. Agreement
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #03)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #03)
Date: August 04, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #03)
Date: August 15, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #02)
Date: August 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #03) Matrimonial Pleadings
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #03)
Date: August 04, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: August 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #02)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #01)
Date: June 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #03)
Date: August 04, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: June 10, 2022ORDER - PRE-TRIAL
Date: August 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 15, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #01) Order RE Motion Seq #1-3, dated 8/15/2022 |
||
August 15, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #03) Order RE Motion Seq #1-3, dated 8/15/2022 |
||
August 15, 2022 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #02) Order RE Motion Seq #1-3, dated 8/15/2022 |
||
August 15, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dated 8/15/2022 |
||
August 15, 2022 |
ORDER - PRE-TRIAL dated 8/15/2022 |
||
August 11, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION | ||
August 11, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A letter from Ms. Davis regarding pay off |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 7 (Motion #03) Mortgage Broker Affidavit |
||
August 04, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION (Motion #03) *Corrected* Notice of Cross Motion |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 (Motion #03) Retainer agreement |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.