Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Triumph Capital Partners, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Franke, George Lawrence, Tarab, Margaret Burke, Weiss, Barry Michael, against John Doe No. I To John Doe No. X, Inclusive, The Last Ten Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To The Plaintiff, The Person Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Premises Described In The Complaint, Judah Mizrahi, Network Media Management, Inc, New York State Department Of Taxation And Finance, Wbl Spo I, Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Berg, James P, Ragan, Ashley Elizabeth, Schleifstein, Daniel Aaron, Weisblatt, Stacey Allyson, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Lawrence Knipel presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLawrence Knipel Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Commercial |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: July 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: August 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF CLAIM TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: February 16, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY Â (Motion #1)
Date: September 08, 2022ORDER - MOTION- SHORT FORM
Date: August 29, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 08, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 14, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1) Notice of Default
Date: July 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - N Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - L Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - P Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023BILL OF COSTS
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - K Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 04, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 22, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 23, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 05, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #2) Notice of Default |
||
January 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N (Motion #2) NOE of MSJ and Sub-Ref Order |
||
January 04, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
January 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #2) Mortgage |
||
January 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #2) Assignment |
||
January 04, 2023 | ORDER ( PROPOSED ) | ||
January 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #2) Guaranty |
||
January 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L (Motion #2) Affidavit in Support |
||
January 04, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 04, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P (Motion #2) Atty Fee Aff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.