Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Lalita Crews, filed a(n) Premises Liability - Torts case represented by Ramirez, Ronald W, against 1040 Kfc Llc, Jam Services And Repairs Llc, Jose M. Nina Bonilla, Kfc Corporation, Qsr East Llc, (total of 5) See All represented by Gardiner, Laura Beth, Organek, Megan Furrer, Salvato, Richard Anthony, Spencer, Sean Michael, Thompson, Rhonda Diane, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Montelione presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Montelione Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other Negligence (Injury On Deft Premises) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypePremises Liability |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 21, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 01, 2021REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 15, 2021REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 15, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 21, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 20, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 20, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 20, 2021REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: July 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: April 13, 2021DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 12, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 26, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: April 13, 2021DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 13, 2021DEMAND FOR: Demand for Discovery & Inspection - Redacted Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: October 25, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 23, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 23, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 17, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 06, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 14, 2021RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 06, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 06, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE *Corrected*
Date: April 07, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 06, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 06, 2022NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM
Date: August 17, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 23, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 07, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 27, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: September 15, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 28, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 17, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: April 06, 2022ORDER - OTHER
Date: April 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 15, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 01, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 25, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 31, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 26, 2022ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION -REQUEST Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 13, 2022STIPULATION - PARTIAL DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: June 01, 2022REPLY TO CROSS-CLAIM (S)
Date: June 17, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 17, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 23, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 17, 2022BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: April 06, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 21, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 18, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 21, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: July 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 01, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 01, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 04, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: August 24, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 01, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 09, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 01, 2022NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI)
Date: September 29, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: February 23, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 23, 2022ANSWER
Date: June 01, 2021ORDER - OTHER
Date: February 06, 2023ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 31, 2023RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: January 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 06, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER final pre note dated 2/1/23 |
||
January 31, 2023 |
ORDER ( PROPOSED ) Proposed Final Pre-Note Order |
||
January 05, 2023 |
RESPONSE TO DEMAND Response to KFC Corp. D&I |
||
November 09, 2022 | Notice of Entry and Order | ||
November 04, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) dtd 11/2/22 |
||
September 29, 2022 |
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OR ADDRESS (POST RJI) Notice of Change of Firm Name |
||
September 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #3) S&C and our Answer |
||
September 01, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3) Aff in Support with word count cert |
||
September 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - F (Motion #3) emls re discontinuance |
||
September 01, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Lease, Assign, Assump |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.