Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Miguel Angel Abreu Hernandez, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Diamond, Beth Michelle, against 345 East 26 Llc, Lg Construction Management Inc., represented by Kelly, Kevin L, Omundson, Erika Lynn, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Richard Montelione presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRichard Montelione Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 24, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Labor Law) |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: February 24, 2021NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION / ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: May 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 07, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: October 19, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 07, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 11, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 07, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 29, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 11, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: October 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 15, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #6)
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #6)
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #6)
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #6)
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Â (Motion #6)
Date: November 02, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #6)
Date: November 02, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: October 26, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: October 26, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: October 26, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: August 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: October 26, 2021ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: February 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: November 04, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: February 24, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 30, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 04, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 24, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 24, 2022ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: May 11, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: February 24, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: July 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 03, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: February 24, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY AND INSPECTION
Date: February 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 24, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 29, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 28, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 30, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 28, 2022ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: May 13, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 28, 2022NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: February 28, 2022ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: May 05, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 05, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 24, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 29, 2021PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: August 12, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 12, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 27, 2021NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 31, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 31, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: October 31, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: July 07, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 02, 2022NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 01, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 14, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 02, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #6)
Date: January 23, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 03, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 03, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: March 15, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 03, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 03, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 03, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: March 16, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: April 23, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 23, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: May 18, 2023AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: May 18, 2023NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 18, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: May 19, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 23, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #7)
Date: April 28, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: April 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: May 18, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: June 13, 2023DEMAND FOR:
Date: August 10, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 10, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Plaintiff's demands for insurance disclosures |
||
June 13, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
May 19, 2023 |
NOTICE OF ENTRY Order with Notice of Entry (re: motion no. 007/to preclude) |
||
May 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
May 18, 2023 | AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH | ||
May 18, 2023 | NOTICE OF MOTION | ||
May 18, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT | ||
April 28, 2023 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #7) Dated April 24, 2023 |
||
April 24, 2023 |
DEMAND FOR: Deficiency Letter |
||
April 23, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.