Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Manuel A. Reyes-Montilla, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Bronstein, Peretz, Yiftach, Shimon, against Arch Bay Holdings Llc, Long Beach Mortgage Company, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Peter P. Sweeney presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2013 |
CategoryCommercial |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions149 days |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time385 days |
COMPLAINT
Date: July 31, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: October 04, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 20, 2013JUDGMENT
Date: August 20, 2014DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: May 14, 2014STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 07, 2013STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 07, 2013JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED)
Date: December 27, 2013NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #001)
Date: December 27, 2013AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT (Motion #001)
Date: October 04, 2013STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: October 04, 2013RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 04, 2013NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #001)
Date: October 04, 2013ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: August 20, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 20, 2014 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT | |
May 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #001) order dated 12/2/13 filed CC 5/13/14 |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | JUDGMENT -TO COURT (PROPOSED) | |
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #001) Affirmation of Service by Mail |
|
December 27, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT W/PROPOSED JDGMT/COUNTER JDGMT (Motion #001) | |
December 02, 2013 | Hearing |
Decided (Motion #001) DEFAULT JUDGMENT MOTION PART XMG (Conversion) Judge: Default Judgement Part, |
|
October 15, 2013 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #001) MOTION PART Judge: Default Judgement Part, |
|
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 07, 2013 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
October 07, 2013 | Motion |
Judgment - Default (Motion #001) Decided: 12/02/2013Closed Before Justice: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul Answer demanded: No Judge: Sweeney, Hon. Peter Paul |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.