Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Amelia Hennighausen, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Seitelman, Mark E, against Kildare Cab Corp., M Islam Md, Sabr Hana-Alla, Tulya Kogan Associates Inc., represented by Mcevoy, John Philip, Moskovits, Ronit Z, Sanzo, Edward Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Kurtz, Jcp presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateJuly 31, 2013 |
CategoryTort |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time1175 days |
STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 18, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: September 24, 2015STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: March 08, 2016DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: July 06, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #1)
Date: March 10, 2015STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: October 18, 2016STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 16, 2013STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #2)
Date: August 04, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: March 10, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: December 30, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 03, 2013STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: April 26, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: February 05, 2015AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: August 04, 2015STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING (Motion #3)
Date: December 30, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #3)
Date: December 30, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #2)
Date: July 06, 2015NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: February 05, 2015ANSWER
Date: September 03, 2013ANSWER
Date: August 16, 2013SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: July 31, 2013Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | |
October 18, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | |
October 06, 2016 | Hearing |
Settled JURY COORDINATING PART 1 2SEL720 (Conversion) Judge: Kurtz, Hon. Donald Scott |
|
July 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 1SEL614 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
June 30, 2016 | Hearing |
Withdrawn (Motion #003) Motion Trial Term 65 Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
|
June 14, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 PRE-TRIAL (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
June 02, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Motion Trial Term 65 Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
|
April 28, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Motion Trial Term 65 Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION (Motion #3) adjourn from April 28, 2016 to June 2, 2016 |
|
March 10, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned (Motion #003) Motion Trial Term 65 Judge: Baily-Schiffman, Hon. Loren |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.