Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Magenu, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Gulko, Asher Chanan, against John Does One-Ten, Mendy Leonorvitz, Nachman Taub, On Time Studios, Llc, On Time Studios Ny, Inc., (total of 6) See All represented by Toumbekis, Peter, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with Bernard J presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateMarch 21, 2016 |
CategoryOther Matters - Contract Non-Commercial |
|
Last RefreshedJuly 31, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
Case Outcome TypeDisposed |
Case Cycle Time304 days |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: November 17, 2016NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: November 17, 2016AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: November 17, 2016REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: May 19, 2016ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: May 05, 2016ANSWER
Date: May 05, 2016SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: March 21, 2016STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: December 15, 2016ORDER - OTHER
Date: August 04, 2016Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2017 | Hearing |
Other Final Disposition (Pre-Note) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART NAES (Conversion) Judge: Graham, Hon. Bernard J. |
|
December 19, 2016 | Hearing |
Marked Off (Motion #001) CENTRAL COMPLIANCE PART NAES (Conversion) Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
December 15, 2016 | Docket Event | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (PRE RJI) | |
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) Memorandum of Law |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1) Notice of Motion |
|
November 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) Affirmation of Asher C. Gulko, Esq. |
|
November 17, 2016 | Motion |
Enforcement (Motion #001) Decided: 12/19/2016Granted Before Justice: Central Compliance Part, Answer demanded: Yes Judge: Central Compliance Part, |
|
August 04, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER - OTHER dtd 7/20/2016, nsp |
|
July 20, 2016 | Hearing |
Held INTAKE PART Supreme Trial (Conversion) Judge: Spodek, Hon. Ellen M. |
|
June 22, 2016 | Hearing |
Adjourned INTAKE PART Judge: Spodek, Hon. Ellen M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.