Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
11 Um Food Corp., Urban Fresh Corp., Young S. Chung, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case represented by Cho, Kenneth Kunho, Kenny, Michael Leo, against Barbara Janus, Colin K. Xie, Does 1 100, Juicebrothers, Llc, represented by Jayaram, Vivek, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts Kings County Supreme Court with LEON RUCHELSMAN presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLEON RUCHELSMAN Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2020 |
CategoryCommercial Division |
Last RefreshedOctober 10, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
Filing Court HouseKings County Supreme Court |
STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: July 31, 2020STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: August 13, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED (Motion #2)
Date: August 10, 2020REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: July 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 01, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1)
Date: July 01, 2020NOTICE OF MOTION (Motion #1)
Date: July 01, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: June 26, 2020ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: June 26, 2020COMPLAINT (AMENDED)
Date: May 27, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 20, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 19, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: March 19, 2020MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 19, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: March 19, 2020COMPLAINT
Date: February 07, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #006) COMMERCIAL MOTION PART 8 Judge: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 |
|
December 02, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #005) COMMERCIAL MOTION PART 8 Judge: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 |
|
November 25, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #005) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 |
|
November 23, 2020 | Motion |
(Motion #006) Before Justice: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 Answer demanded: No Judge: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 |
|
November 06, 2020 | Motion |
(Motion #005) Before Justice: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 Answer demanded: No Judge: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 |
|
November 05, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #006) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 |
|
November 05, 2020 | Hearing |
(Motion #003) COMMERCIAL MOTION PART 8 Judge: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 |
|
November 04, 2020 | Hearing |
SUBMITTED (Motion #004) COMMERCIAL MOTION PART 8 Judge: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 |
|
October 30, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #004) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 |
|
October 28, 2020 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #003) COMMERCIAL MOTION PART 8 Judge: LEON RUCHELSMAN, COMM 8 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.