Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Division 1181 Amalgamated Transit Union - New York Employees Pension Fund, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case represented by Brook, Richard Alan, against Allied Transit Corp., Jofaz Transportation, Inc., New York City Department Of Education, Pride Transportation Services, Inc., Quality Transportation Corp., (total of 5) See All represented by Dashiell, Craig Laurence, Graw, Andrew Elliott, Kane, Rachel B, Kaplan, Michael Andrew, Newberger, Netanel, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Reginald Boddie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2022 |
CategoryCommercial - Contract |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: January 07, 2022SUMMONS
Date: January 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: January 26, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: January 07, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (PRE RJI)
Date: January 28, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: March 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 14, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 14, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: March 14, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #3)
Date: April 01, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 31, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: March 14, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER ) Â (Motion #2)
Date: April 01, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: April 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2022ADDENDUM - GENERAL (840A)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #3)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #4)
Date: April 13, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: June 24, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: April 13, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #2)
Date: March 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #5)
Date: April 13, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #2)
Date: June 30, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: September 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 09, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER - ( REQUEST TO SO ORDER )
Date: August 09, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: August 12, 2022STIPULATION - SO ORDERED
Date: August 19, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: July 29, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER - INTERIM
Date: July 29, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #4)
Date: November 21, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #5)
Date: November 21, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 29, 2022STIPULATION - TIME TO ANSWER
Date: December 01, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 09, 2023PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: January 12, 2023ANSWER (AMENDED)
Date: January 25, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 20, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: December 20, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: December 21, 2022NOTICE OF APPEAL
Date: December 27, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: December 27, 2022INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT
Date: December 20, 2022PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 20, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 25, 2023 | ANSWER (AMENDED) | ||
January 12, 2023 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
January 09, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
December 27, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
December 27, 2022 | NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION) | ||
December 21, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
December 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 20, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | ||
December 20, 2022 | INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT | ||
December 20, 2022 | PROOF OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.