Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Joshua Maltzman, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Strier, Todd Jason, against The City Of New York, represented by Counsel, Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Kings Cdp22 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2024 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This is a complaint filed by Joshua Maltzman in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, against the City of New York. The complaint alleges that the defendant's negligence in maintaining a New York City Department of Sanitation v...
RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: February 08, 2024ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 27, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 30, 2024PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: February 08, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 09, 2024CONSENT TO EFILING
Date: January 05, 2024SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 27, 2024 | ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 08, 2024 | RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE | ||
February 08, 2024 | PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST | ||
January 30, 2024 |
ANSWER City's Answer |
||
January 09, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2024 | CONSENT TO EFILING | ||
January 05, 2024 | SUMMONS + COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.