Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Melba Brown, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Papandrew, Catherine Ann, Schaefer, Sean William, against John Doe Named Being Fictitious, True Name Unknown, Metropolitan Transportation Authority, New York City Transit Authority, represented by Frame, Theresa Ann, Williams, Renee, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Gina Abadi presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2024 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint, filed in the Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of Kings, seeks an order to grant Melba Brown leave to serve a late Notice of Claim and obtain other appropriate relief. The complaint arises from an accident on October 27, ...
CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: March 12, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: March 12, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 12, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: February 05, 2024AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 12, 2024STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: February 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Rejection of Claim
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 02, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: January 22, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: January 05, 2024RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 05, 2024STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Proof of email with Letter
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Personal Injury Claim Form
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 05, 2024EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Notices of Claim for NYTA and MTA
Date: January 05, 2024ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (PROPOSED)
Date: January 05, 2024PETITION *Corrected*
Date: January 05, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2024 | CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY ) | ||
March 12, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Ambulance Call Report |
||
March 12, 2024 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A No-Fault Denial Form |
||
March 12, 2024 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY Includes Certification of Word Count |
||
February 05, 2024 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE | ||
February 05, 2024 | STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION | ||
February 05, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service for NYCTA John Doe |
||
February 05, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Service For NYCTA |
||
February 02, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Aff of Service for MTA John Doe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.