Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dienna O. Mohammed, Selena Castillo, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mosaku, Adewale Akim, against Lance M. Smith, represented by Shapiro, Adam Philip, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Jury Coordinating Part 1 presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2020 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedOctober 12, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - I Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 05, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: October 22, 2021ANSWER WITH COUNTER-CLAIM(S)
Date: April 07, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 22, 2021REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: April 16, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 16, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 05, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 01, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 05, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #2)
Date: January 06, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: December 01, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY/COPY OF ENTERED ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: March 29, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 05, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: October 05, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: February 18, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION
Date: December 16, 2021CERTIFICATION OF SIGNATURE ( ATTORNEY OR PARTY )
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #2)
Date: December 01, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: March 28, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: April 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 22, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 22, 2021ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 04, 2021STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: December 01, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 22, 2021NOTE OF ISSUE:WITH JURY
Date: November 11, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 05, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9 Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 22, 2021AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: December 01, 2021CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: December 01, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #3)
Date: October 05, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #3)
Date: November 18, 2022STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: August 16, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: August 16, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 16, 2023 | STIPULATION - DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
August 16, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING | ||
November 18, 2022 |
ORDER - OTHER (Motion #3) dtd 11/10/22 |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I (Motion #3) Good Faith Email 7/5/22 |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - J (Motion #3) Good Faith Email 7/18/22 |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #3) Plaintiff Motion for Liability |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #3) Motion to Vacate |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #3) Note of Issue |
||
October 05, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #3) Good Faith Letter |
||
October 05, 2022 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.