Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Citimortgage, Inc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Commissioner Of Social Services Of The City Of New York Social Services District, Jane Smith, Janice Mcrae, Lois Ramlal, Neighborhood Housing Services Of New York City, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin Sheares Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 16, 2015 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedNovember 29, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - Q Bankruptcy Close Case Order for Case No. 20-41053 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 08, 2021COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: April 16, 2015EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: December 08, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE-SIGNED
Date: September 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - O Bankruptcy Close Case Order for Case No. 19-44547 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 08, 2021STIPULATION - SETTLEMENT (POST RJI)
Date: September 14, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M Bankruptcy Dismissal Order for Case No. 18-45031 Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 10, 2021DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: December 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: December 08, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: September 10, 2021STIPULATION - ADJOURNMENT OF MOTION
Date: September 24, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Summons, Complaint, LP and Certificate of Merit Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: December 08, 2021NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 08, 2021NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE
Date: December 21, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - P
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: September 10, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2021ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 10, 2021RJI -RE: OTHER
Date: May 14, 2015Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 21, 2021 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
December 21, 2021 |
NOTICE OF APPEAL/INFORMATIONAL STATEMENT/COPY OF ORDER/PROOF OF SERVICE Notice of Appeal with Informational Statement |
||
December 15, 2021 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION | ||
December 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L Notice of Sale dated August 9, 2018 |
||
December 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - Q Bankruptcy Close Case Order for Case No. 20-41053 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Bankruptcy Close Case Order for Case No. 20-41053 Redacted |
||
December 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - P Notice of Sale dated January 29, 2020 |
||
December 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O Bankruptcy Close Case Order for Case No. 19-44547 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Bankruptcy Close Case Order for Case No. 19-44547 Redacted |
||
December 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - N Notice of Sale dated June 26, 2019 |
||
December 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - M Bankruptcy Dismissal Order for Case No. 18-45031 Redacted per 22 NYCRR Bankruptcy Dismissal Order for Case No. 18-45031 Redacted |
||
December 08, 2021 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Notice of Entry of Order Granting Summary Judgment |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.