Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
U.S. Bank National Association, As Trustee For First Franklin Mortgage Loan Trust 2007-Ff2, Mortgage Loan Asset-Backed Certificates, Series 2007-Ff2, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Cheverko, Geraldine A, against Barry Thomas, Criminal Court Of The City Of New York, Empire Porfolios Inc, Gwendolyn Williams, Jesse Williams, (total of 10) See All represented by Glatstein, Elliot Michael, in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Cenceria Edwards presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCenceria Edwards Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 20, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: November 20, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: November 20, 2020AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 26, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #8) *Corrected*
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 26, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #8)
Date: January 26, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 26, 2022ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 7 Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 17, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: July 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: December 27, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 27, 2022NOTICE OF SALE
Date: November 03, 2022ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #8)
Date: July 08, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: November 03, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: December 27, 2022ORDER ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 6 Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2 Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 5 Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4 Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: December 27, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 27, 2022AFFIDAVIT OF PUBLICATION
Date: January 18, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1 Â (Motion #9) Summons & Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: December 27, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 17, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3 Â (Motion #9)
Date: January 17, 2023LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 28, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 05, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: January 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 17, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 06, 2023NOTICE OF CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 06, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 11
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 9
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 8 Summons & Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: February 14, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 10
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION
Date: February 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: February 14, 2023NOTIFICATION FROM COURT
Date: February 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY
Date: March 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #10)
Date: March 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #10)
Date: March 05, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #10)
Date: March 05, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 05, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN REPLY | ||
March 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #10) SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT |
||
March 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #10) ORDER VACATING DEFAULT |
||
March 05, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #10) ACRIS RECORD |
||
February 24, 2023 | NOTIFICATION FROM COURT | ||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 11 9.2.2014 Notice of Entry in Countrywide v Darek Harris |
||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 9 Deed to Proposed Intervenor |
||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 8 Summons & Complaint Redacted per 22 NYCRR Summons & Complaint Redacted |
||
February 14, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 10 6/2018 Affidavit in Opposition by 1216 E Realty LLC |
||
February 14, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN OPPOSITION TO CROSS-MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.