Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with Martin M. Solomon presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedMay 05, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 13, 2015 | Hearing |
Verdict PART 66 Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Richard |
|
October 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Commenced PART 66 SJT (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Richard |
|
October 07, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned PART 66 SJT/PICKING (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Richard |
|
September 09, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned PART 66 EVID HRNG (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Richard |
|
July 30, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned PART 66 SJT (Conversion) Judge: Velasquez, Hon. Richard |
|
July 30, 2015 | Hearing |
JURY COORDINATING PART 1 5SEL610 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
June 10, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 4SEL325 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
March 25, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 3SE1211 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
March 19, 2015 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 2SE1211 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
|
December 11, 2014 | Hearing |
Adjourned JURY COORDINATING PART 1 1SEL929 (Conversion) Judge: Jury Coordinating Part, |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.