Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other case in the jurisdiction of Kings County. This case was filed in Kings County Superior Courts with IRA HARKAVY (PT. 42) presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 14, 2006 |
CategoryOther |
Last RefreshedOctober 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 27, 2006 | Hearing |
MOTION WITHDRAWN (Motion #002) MOTION TRIAL TERM 42 325E Judge: IRA HARKAVY (PT. 42) |
|
September 13, 2006 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #002) SUBSEQUENT MOTION PART Judge: IRA HARKAVY (PT. 42) |
|
September 13, 2006 | Hearing |
TRANSFERRED (Motion #001) MOTION TRIAL TERM 42 STIP 325E Judge: IRA HARKAVY (PT. 42) |
|
September 11, 2006 | Motion |
DISMISSAL (Motion #002) Decided: 09/27/2006MOTION WITHDRAWN Before Justice: IRA HARKAVY (PT. 42) Answer demanded: No Judge: IRA HARKAVY (PT. 42) |
|
August 16, 2006 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) MOTION TRIAL TERM 42 STIP Judge: IRA HARKAVY (PT. 42) |
|
July 14, 2006 | Motion |
TRUSTEE/JUDICIAL SETTLE ACCT (Motion #001) Decided: 09/15/2006CASE DISPOSED Before Justice: IRA HARKAVY (PT. 42) Answer demanded: No Judge: IRA HARKAVY (PT. 42) |
|
July 14, 2006 | Hearing |
ADJOURNED (Motion #001) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE PART Judge: IRA HARKAVY (PT. 42) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.