Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Donna Lewis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Parnas, Ilya E., against Dennis Rodriguez, Mayra Colon, represented by Reinstein, Richard Adam, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Peter P. Sweeney presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Motor Vehicle |
Last RefreshedJuly 22, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: April 27, 2022STIPULATION - OTHER
Date: November 18, 2021ANSWER
Date: November 04, 2021AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 27, 2021SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: October 01, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: November 15, 2021STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: October 13, 2021RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 13, 2021ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE
Date: November 03, 2022THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: December 10, 2021ANSWER WITH CROSS-CLAIM(S)
Date: December 08, 2021NOTICE TO TAKE DEPOSITION
Date: December 08, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: December 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: December 10, 2021THIRD PARTY SUMMONS/COMPLAINT
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Argudo - Ex.C - Written Contract
Date: December 10, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 20, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 20, 2022ANSWER
Date: February 10, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: February 10, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 21, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: January 21, 2022ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: February 10, 2022ANSWER
Date: January 21, 2022ANSWER TO THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT
Date: January 21, 2022NOTICE OF DEPOSITION
Date: January 21, 2022DEMAND FOR BILL OF PARTICULARS
Date: February 10, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 02, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 15, 2022RJI -RE: REQUEST FOR PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: June 08, 2022PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE REQUEST
Date: June 08, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: May 02, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 01, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: March 11, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: June 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D subcontract between Procida and MP Design
Date: January 20, 2022RESPONSE TO DEMAND
Date: June 29, 2022ORDER - PRELIMINARY CONFERENCE
Date: July 20, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: September 15, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2022DEMAND FOR:
Date: July 20, 2022AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH
Date: October 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 25, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: March 07, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND CLAIMS TO SURPLUS MONIES
Date: September 28, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2022 |
ORDER - COMPLIANCE CONFERENCE dtd 10/26/22 nsp |
||
October 25, 2022 |
NOTICE OF MOTION Unfiled 3215 Mailing Affidavit-MICHAEL RAGIN AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE TO THE ESTATE OF EVELYN RAGIN-4 ... show more |
||
October 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D (Motion #1) GF letter |
||
October 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B (Motion #1) Answers |
||
October 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C (Motion #1) 1st Dem for AZs |
||
October 25, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION OF GOOD FAITH Unfiled Affidavit of Service-REGINALD PORTER AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE TO THE ESTATE OF EVELYN RAGIN-4 ... show more |
||
October 25, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Unfiled Affidavit of Service-MICHAEL RAGIN AS HEIR AND DISTRIBUTEE TO THE ESTATE OF EVELYN RAGIN-490 ... show more |
||
October 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A (Motion #1) S&C |
||
October 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - G (Motion #1) GF letter |
||
October 25, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E (Motion #1) 2nd Dem for AZs |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.