Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Solange Capital, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nierer, Cynthia Anne, Weinberg, Seth Daniel, against Bruce Boone, New York City Environmental Control Board, New York City Parking Violations Bureau, New York City Transit Adjudication Bureau, Sharon Boone, (total of 5) See All represented by Nicholson, Alice Ann, in the jurisdiction of Kings County, NY, . Kings County, NY Superior Courts with Robin Sheares presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRobin Sheares Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 19, 2013 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationKings County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 11, 2022NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: August 26, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 4
Date: August 04, 2022HARDSHIP DECLARATION
Date: July 20, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A-I Exhibits A-I
Date: January 11, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: January 11, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: August 10, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: January 11, 2022NO FEE AUTHORIZATION (LETTER/ORDER/AFFIRMATION)
Date: January 11, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 14, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: August 10, 2022COUNTY CLERK MINUTES -PRIOR TO CONVERSION
Date: July 19, 2013EXHIBIT(S) Â - 2
Date: August 04, 2022NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI)
Date: January 19, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - 1
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - 3
Date: August 04, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: August 10, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: August 10, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 19, 2023 | NOTICE OF BANKRUPTCY (POST RJI) | ||
August 26, 2022 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
August 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A JFS |
||
August 10, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Response To Letter Filed By Alice A. Nicholson, Esq. on August 4, 2020 Concerning Disbarment of Andr Response To Letter Filed By Alice A. Nicholson, Esq. on August 4, 2020 Concerning Disbarment of Andr ... show more |
||
August 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B BRC Docket |
||
August 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - D NYSCEF Consent |
||
August 10, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C Conference Appearance |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 4 Appellate Division Order re Soleil Disbarred |
||
August 04, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Regarding Automatic Stay |
||
August 04, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - 2 Consent to Change Attorney from Rooney to Salta |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.