Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nancy M. Robbins, Ronald C. Robbins, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by Brotherton, Justin Frederick, against Board Of Assessment Review, Its Assessor, The Town Of Hounsfield, New York, represented by Mccarthy, Ryan Lawrence, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts with James P Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
This complaint is a verified petition filed by Ronald C. Robbins and Nancy M. Robbins against the Town of Hounsfield, New York, its assessor, and board of assessment review. The petitioners claim that the assessment of their property, located at 1416...
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: October 16, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: October 11, 2023ANSWER
Date: October 24, 2023ORDER - OTHER Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 19, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S)
Date: September 29, 2023PETITION
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 29, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: September 29, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: September 29, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 24, 2023 | ANSWER | ||
October 19, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER (Motion #1) | ||
October 16, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
October 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Village Clerk |
||
October 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Treasurer |
||
October 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Sackets Harbor School District |
||
October 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Affidavit of Mailing |
||
October 11, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Hounsfield Town Clerk |
||
September 29, 2023 | NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) | ||
September 29, 2023 | PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.