Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Nsf Chaumont Site 3, Llc, filed a(n) Assessment Challenge - Tax case represented by D'Ambrogio, Emanuela, Spitzer, Daniel Alan, Zomerfeld, Henry Anthony, against Assessor For The Town Of Lyme, New York, Board Of Assessment Review For The Town Of Lyme, New York, Town Of Lyme, New York, represented by Burrows, James A., in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts with James P Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Tax Certiorari |
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaTax |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeAssessment Challenge |
ANSWER
Date: August 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 31, 2023NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) Â (Motion #1)
Date: July 31, 2023ORDER - OTHER
Date: October 05, 2023PETITION
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 31, 2023RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 31, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 31, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: August 09, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 05, 2023 | ORDER - OTHER | ||
August 31, 2023 | Answer - Site 3 | ||
August 10, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of Notice of Commencement, NYSCEF Confirmation Notice, RJI, Notice of Petition Affidavit of Service of Notice of Commencement, NYSCEF Confirmation Notice, RJI, Notice of Petition ... show more |
||
August 09, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE (Motion #1) Affidavit of Service of E-file Notice, Notice of Petition and Summons, Verified Petition and RJI |
||
July 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - B Board of Education Minutes |
||
July 31, 2023 |
NOTICE OF PETITION ACCOMPANYING COMMENCEMENT DOC(S) (Motion #1) Notice of Petition and Summons |
||
July 31, 2023 |
PETITION Verified Petition/Complaint |
||
July 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - E Letter to Board of Assessment Review Supporting Grievance |
||
July 31, 2023 |
EXHIBIT(S) - C District's Letter Regarding PILOT Agreements |
||
July 31, 2023 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.