Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Michael P Mcwilliams, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Children'S Home Of Jefferson County, represented by Weber, Richard Lewis, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts with James P Mcclusky presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJames P Mcclusky Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2023 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Neg, Def, Prima Facie Tor) |
Last RefreshedJanuary 25, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: November 06, 2023NOTICE OF ENTRY
Date: November 06, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 19, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: October 19, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 19, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: June 08, 2023SUMMONS
Date: June 08, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2023 |
DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION (Motion #1) Motions 1 & 2 Supplemental Memorandum Decision and Order |
||
November 06, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
October 19, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT (Motion #1) SUPPLEMENTAL MEMORANDUM OF LAW |
||
October 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT (Motion #1) AFFIDAVIT OF DR. MARIANNE DIMATTEO |
||
October 19, 2023 |
MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION (Motion #1) Supplemental Memorandum of Law in Opposition (per Court's request) |
||
October 19, 2023 |
AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION (Motion #1) SUPPLEMENTAL ATTORNEY AFFIRMATION |
||
October 19, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
September 21, 2023 | NOTICE OF ENTRY | ||
September 21, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
September 14, 2023 | DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.