Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Daniel Morgan, filed a(n) Slander,Libel,Defamation - Torts case against Jacie R Gutierrez, represented by Kirwan, Terry J., in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts with James McClusky presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 15, 2021 |
CategoryTorts - Other (Defamation) |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeSlander,Libel,Defamation |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: August 25, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: September 07, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: September 07, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: August 22, 2022NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: November 14, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 26, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #2)
Date: October 06, 2022STATEMENT OF MATERIAL FACTS
Date: September 07, 2022SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: December 15, 2021ANSWER
Date: March 22, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: May 03, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: March 22, 2022OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: April 28, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: May 25, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 22, 2022COMPLAINT
Date: April 08, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION
Date: May 25, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: May 25, 2022DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: July 29, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: May 25, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: June 04, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: June 22, 2022NOTICE OF MOTION (AMENDED)
Date: June 21, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: June 22, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN REPLY
Date: July 06, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: May 31, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: July 06, 2022COURT NOTICE
Date: July 06, 2022AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #2)
Date: August 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: June 22, 2022ANSWER
Date: August 31, 2022REPLY TO COUNTERCLAIM(S)
Date: September 06, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW
Date: September 07, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Â (Motion #3)
Date: September 12, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: September 09, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: January 12, 2023OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT
Date: January 12, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 12, 2023MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: January 18, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2023 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
January 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION | ||
January 12, 2023 | OTHER COURT FILED DOCUMENT | ||
January 12, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
November 14, 2022 | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI) | ||
October 06, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #2) Also pertains to Motion #3 |
||
September 12, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT (Motion #3) Motions #2 and #3 adjourned to October 20, 2022 at 9:30 a.m. |
||
September 09, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Letter to Hon. James McClusky |
||
September 07, 2022 | AFFIRMATION | ||
September 07, 2022 | NOTICE OF MOTION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.