Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) Consumer Debt - Creditor case represented by Scully, James Paul, against Steven Lillie, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 18, 2021 |
CategoryOther Matters - Consumer Credit (Card) Debt Buyer Plaintiff |
Last RefreshedDecember 03, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeConsumer Debt |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: August 18, 2021AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2022JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED)
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION
Date: March 22, 2022STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: September 15, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: March 22, 2022ADDITIONAL NOTICE OF CONSUMER CREDIT TRANSACTION
Date: September 24, 2021AFFIRMATION
Date: March 22, 2022SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT
Date: October 11, 2023JUDGMENT
Date: March 23, 2022AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: September 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 11, 2023 | SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT | ||
March 23, 2022 | JUDGMENT | ||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT SELLER |
||
March 22, 2022 | JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT (PROPOSED) | ||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT SUPPLEMENTAL AFF OF FACTS |
||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT AFF OF FACTS |
||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION OF NON-EXPIRATION OF STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS |
||
March 22, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - A INVOICE |
||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIRMATION NON-MILITARY AFFIRMATION |
||
March 22, 2022 |
AFFIDAVIT DEBT BUYER |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.