Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Tennenbaum, Charles, Tennenbaum, Karen, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case represented by Berg, William Leonard, against Napa Valley Brewing Company, Inc., represented by Christianson, Clay Jerome, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Raymond A. Guadagni presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateDecember 19, 2006 |
CategoryOther Pi/Pd/Wd Unlimited (23) |
Time To Trial335 days |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
|
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
|
Case Cycle Time416 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Tennenbaum, C. vs. Napa Valley Brewing Company, Inc. Motion OSC Details: 211201 - Court's Motion To Dismiss ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
January 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 932210 - Attorney for Defendant NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT [932210] |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissal 233910-Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 932210 - Attorney for Defendant DISMISSAL [233910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT [932210] |
|
January 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Jan 18 2008 Type: 243110 - Entry of Request for Dismissal Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing 212920-Notice of Hearing Motion/OSC Detail: 211201 - Court's Motion To Dismiss Filed/Issued By: NOTICE OF HEARING [212920] Motion: COURT'S MOTION TO DISMISS [211201] Additional Description : Filed By |
|
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Tennenbaum, C. vs. Napa Valley Brewing Company, Inc. Motion OSC Details: 211201 - Court's Motion To Dismiss ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
January 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Minute Order 213610-Minute Order Filed/Issued By: MINUTE ORDER [213610] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By |
|
December 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Notice 212910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 932210 - Attorney for Defendant NOTICE [212910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT [932210] |
|
December 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause (Non-DCSS) 231210-OSC Hearing; Tennenbaum, C. vs. Napa Valley Brewing Company, Inc. Motion OSC Details: 211201 - Court's Motion To Dismiss ; Judge: J21130 Guadagni Raymond A. Judge: Guadagni, Raymond A. |
|
December 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Correspondence 212510-Correspondence Add'l Description: Rescheduling OSC Re Dismissal Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff CORRESPONDENCE [212510] Motion: Additional Description : RESCHEDULING OSC RE DISMISSAL Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.