Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Joan Berry, filed a(n) General Property - Property case represented by Stone, Christina E., against Stacey J Berry, represented by Geurtsen, David Baertus, Whelan, Terrence John, in the jurisdiction of Jefferson County, NY, . Jefferson County, NY Superior Courts Jefferson County Supreme Court with William Ramseier presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2020 |
CategoryReal Property - Other (Breach Of Contract) |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationJefferson County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseJefferson County Supreme Court |
SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: January 13, 2020RJI -RE: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: January 13, 2020ANSWER
Date: February 05, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE
Date: January 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 14, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT Â (Motion #1)
Date: May 14, 2020STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 13, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 04, 2020ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE ( PROPOSED )
Date: January 13, 2020AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF PROPOSED OSC/EXPARTE APP
Date: January 13, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: March 04, 2020ANSWER
Date: March 20, 2020EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: January 13, 2020NOTICE OF APPEARANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 05, 2020AFFIDAVIT Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 20, 2020PROOF OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 20, 2020AFFIRMATION Â (Motion #1)
Date: March 20, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: September 22, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: October 28, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: November 18, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 05, 2021LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 13, 2022SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (PRE RJI)
Date: February 20, 2020LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: April 14, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: January 13, 2020NOTICE OF FILING DURING THE COVID-19 PUBLIC HEALTH EMERGENCY
Date: May 14, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: May 20, 2022ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR
Date: June 27, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Â (Motion #1)
Date: January 22, 2020COURT NOTICE
Date: April 09, 2020LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE Â (Motion #1)
Date: April 13, 2022LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT
Date: October 29, 2021EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: January 13, 2020DECISION + ORDER ON MOTION
Date: June 15, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 30, 2022 | SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY (POST RJI) | ||
December 16, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
June 27, 2022 | ORDER - REFERENCE TO ADR | ||
May 20, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
April 14, 2022 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference April 21, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. |
||
April 13, 2022 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT | ||
April 13, 2022 |
LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE (Motion #1) Status Update |
||
October 29, 2021 |
LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT Conference November 15, 2021 at 3:00 p.m. |
||
October 28, 2021 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
October 05, 2021 | LETTER/CORRESPONDENCE FROM COURT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.