Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing, Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Grigg, Natalie Ann, Mullen, Richard S, against Any Unknown Heirs, Devisees, Distributees Or Successors In Interest Of The Late Sheila Koop Aka Sheila M. Koop, If Living, And If Any Be Dead, Any And All Persons Who Are Spouses, Widows, Grantees, Mortgagees, Lienors, Heirs, Devisees, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Or Successors In Interest Of Such Of Them As May Be Dead, And Their Spouses, Heirs, Devisees, Distributees And Successors In Interest, All Of Whom And Whose Names And Places Of Residence Are Unknown To Plaintiff, Frederick M. Koop, John Doe, John R. Koop Jr., Lvnv Funding Llc, (total of 9) See All represented by Longeretta, Paul Michael, in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by Lakeview Loan Servicing, LLC against various defendants, including unknown heirs, devisees, distributees, and successors in interest of the late Sheila Koop. The plaintiff alleges that Sheila Koop execu...
Any Unknown Heirs, Devisees, Distributees Or Successors In Interest Of The Late Sheila Koop Aka Sheila M. Koop, If Living, And If Any Be Dead, Any And All Persons Who Are Spouses, Widows, Grantees, Mortgagees, Lienors, Heirs, Devisees, Distributees, Executors, Administrators, Or Successors In Interest Of Such Of Them As May Be Dead, And Their Spouses, Heirs, Devisees, Distributees And Successors In Interest, All Of Whom And Whose Names And Places Of Residence Are Unknown To Plaintiff
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 11, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 14, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 05, 2024ANSWER
Date: January 03, 2024AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: December 18, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT
Date: November 30, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: November 30, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: November 30, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: December 11, 2023EXHIBIT(S) Â - A/B
Date: November 30, 2023SUMMONS + COMPLAINT
Date: November 30, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Michael C. Koop |
||
January 05, 2024 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 05, 2024 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE John Doe |
||
January 03, 2024 | Answer | ||
December 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE John R. Koop, Jr |
||
December 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE Frederick M. Koop |
||
December 18, 2023 |
AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE John R. Koop, Jr. |
||
December 14, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 11, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
December 11, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.