Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, F K A, The Bank Of New York As Successor In Interest To Jpmorgan Chase Bank, N. A., As Trustee For Amortizing Residential Collateral Trust Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2001-Bc6, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Di Caro, John A, against John Doe #1 Through John Doe #2, The Last Twelve Names Being Fictitious And Unknown To Plaintiff, The Persons Or Parties Intended Being The Tenants, Occupants, Persons Or Corporations, If Any, Having Or Claiming An Interest In Or Lien Upon The Subject Property Described In The Complaint, People Of The State Of New York, Theresa L. Marko, in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts with Mark R Rose presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2023 |
CategoryReal Property - Mortgage Foreclosure - Residential |
Last RefreshedJanuary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS
Date: February 14, 2023NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI)
Date: February 14, 2023CERTIFICATE OF MERIT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2023SUMMONS WITH NOTICE
Date: January 12, 2023COMPLAINT Redacted per 22 NYCRR
Date: January 12, 2023NOTICE TO DEFENDANT (PER AO-131-20)
Date: January 12, 2023NOTICE OF PENDENCY
Date: January 12, 2023ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE
Date: February 03, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 06, 2023RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE
Date: February 02, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 24, 2023AFFIDAVIT
Date: February 02, 2023ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F)
Date: February 02, 2023COURT NOTICE
Date: February 03, 2023STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING
Date: January 20, 2023AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: January 20, 2023Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2023 | CANCELLATION OF NOTICE OF PENDENCY / LIS PENDENS | ||
February 14, 2023 | NOTICE OF DISCONTINUANCE (POST RJI) | ||
February 06, 2023 | AFFIDAVIT | ||
February 03, 2023 | ATTACHMENT TO COURT NOTICE | ||
February 03, 2023 | COURT NOTICE | ||
February 02, 2023 | RJI -RE: RESIDENTIAL MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE | ||
February 02, 2023 | Affidavit of Service by Mail | ||
February 02, 2023 | ADDENDUM - FORECLOSURE (840F) | ||
January 24, 2023 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
January 20, 2023 | STATEMENT OF AUTHORIZATION FOR ELECTRONIC FILING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.