Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Dell Technologies Inc., filed a(n) General Arbitration - Arbitration case represented by Berman, Daniel B., against Cicilia Gilbert, represented by Weiss, Jillian Todd, in the jurisdiction of Herkimer County, NY, . Herkimer County, NY Superior Courts with Charles C Merrell presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCharles C Merrell Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 15, 2022 |
CategorySpecial Proceedings - Cplr Article 75 |
Last RefreshedOctober 04, 2023 |
Practice AreaArbitration |
Filing LocationHerkimer County, NY |
Matter TypeGeneral Arbitration |
EXHIBIT(S) Â - I
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI)
Date: July 20, 2022AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE
Date: July 19, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 21, 2022LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: July 15, 2022RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 15, 2022MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - L
Date: July 15, 2022AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - O
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - K
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - N
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - M
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - J
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - F
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - H
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - G
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - E
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - B
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - D
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - C
Date: July 15, 2022EXHIBIT(S) Â - A
Date: July 15, 2022NOTICE OF PETITION
Date: July 15, 2022PETITION
Date: July 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 21, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 20, 2022 |
NOTICE OF REMOVAL / REMAND (POST RJI) Notice of Removal |
||
July 19, 2022 | AFFIRMATION/AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE | ||
July 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - I Hearing Transcript |
||
July 15, 2022 | LETTER / CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE | ||
July 15, 2022 | RJI -RE: NOTICE OF PETITION | ||
July 15, 2022 | MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN SUPPORT | ||
July 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - L April 12, 2022 Supplemental Submission |
||
July 15, 2022 | AFFIDAVIT OR AFFIRMATION IN SUPPORT OF MOTION | ||
July 15, 2022 |
EXHIBIT(S) - O Partial Final Award |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.